FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
|
Board of Governors |
First Appointed |
Term Expires |
Voting FOMC Member |
2014 |
2015 |
2016 |
Janet Yellen*
Chair |
Oct 4, 2010 Feb 3, 2014 |
Jan 31, 2024 Feb 3, 2018 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Stanley Fischer
Vice Chair |
May 28, 2014 Jun 16, 2014 |
Jan 31, 2020 Jun 12, 2018 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Daniel K. Tarullo |
Jan 28, 2009 |
Jan 31, 2022 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Jerome H. Powell |
May 25, 2012 |
Jan 31, 2028 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Lael Brainard |
June 16, 2014 |
Jan 31, 2026 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
VACANT |
|
|
yes |
yes |
yes |
VACANT |
|
|
yes |
yes |
yes |
|
Federal Reserve
Bank Presidents |
First Appointed |
Retirement Date Announced |
Voting FOMC Member |
2014 |
2015 |
2016 |
William Dudley, New York** |
Jan 27, 2009 |
|
yes |
yes |
yes |
Dennis Lockhart, Atlanta |
Mar 1, 2007 |
|
|
yes |
|
Eric Rosengren, Boston |
Jul 23, 2007 |
|
|
|
yes |
Charles L. Evans, Chicago |
Sep 1, 2007 |
|
|
yes |
|
Loretta J. Mester, Cleveland |
Jun 1, 2014 |
|
yes |
|
yes |
Robert E Kaplan, Dallas |
Sep 8, 2015 |
|
|
yes |
|
Esther George, Kanas City |
Oct 1, 2011 |
|
|
|
yes |
Narayana Kocherlakota, Minneapolis*** |
Oct 8, 2009 |
Jun 8, 2015 |
yes |
|
|
Patrick T. Harker, Philadelphia |
Jul 1, 2015 |
|
yes |
|
|
Jeffrey M. Lacker, Richmond |
Aug 1, 2004 |
|
|
yes |
|
James B. Bullard, St. Louis |
Apr 1, 2008 |
|
|
|
yes |
John C. Williams, San Francisco |
Mar 1, 2011 |
|
|
yes |
|
* Chair, Federal Open Market Committee
** Vice Chairman, Federal Open Market Committee
***Neel Kashkari to take post on Jan 1, 2016, appointed on Nov 10, 2015
|
Updated November 10, 2015
|
About the FED FED Watching Indicators Key FED Facts
|
Legal Notices | ©Copyright 1998-2024 Econoday, Inc.
|
powered by
|
|
|